Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


GC Assist
CC30419
9429042976035
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31
GC3

Address for service

PO Box 744
Palmerston North Central
Palmerston North
4440
Level Two
Capital Fund House
357 Main Street
Palmerston North
4410

Charity's other details

06 882 9501


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of GC3. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
GC Aid
GC Assist
Global Connections In Mission

Purpose & Structure


Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Religious activities

Education / training / research

Religious groups

Children / young people

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
John Donald Barris Trustee 13/07/2024
Rebecca de Jong Trustee 20/03/2021
Christopher Graeme Bailey Trustee 21/03/2020
Bruce William Stormer Trustee 2/04/2016
Christopher George Franklyn Trustee 3/03/2012

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Rebekah Louise Opie Trustee 13/07/2024
Richard Sefton Marshall Trustee 29/04/2023
Lynnette May Stark Trustee 20/03/2021
Christopher Douglas Hill Trustee 21/03/2020
Karen June Brookes Trustee 21/03/2020
Russell John Thorp Trustee 21/03/2020
Graham Duncan Fletcher Trustee 2/04/2016
David John Cantwell Trustee 5/05/2014
John Edward Hodgkinson Trustee 17/11/2012
William Henry Stormer Trustee 4/03/2011
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
22/07/2024 NOC015
28/06/2023 NOC014
22/04/2021 NOC013
17/04/2020 NOC012
26/09/2019 NOC011
27/04/2016 NOC010
8/05/2014 NOC009
26/03/2013 NOC004
26/03/2013 AR006
22/11/2012 NOC003
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.