Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Global Connections In Mission
GCIM
CC30290
9429042990895
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31
GC3

Address for service

PO Box 744
Palmerston North Central
Palmerston North
4440
Level Two
Capital Fund House
357 Main Street
Palmerston North
4410

Charity's other details

06 882 9501

Oceania

Australia, Fiji, Micronesia, Papua New Guinea, Samoa, Tonga, Tuvalu, Vanuatu

Africa

Angola, Botswana, Cameroon, Central African Republic, Chad, Congo, Congo, Democratic Republic of, Ethiopia, Kenya, Liberia, Mozambique, Niger, Nigeria, South Africa, Uganda, Zambia, Zimbabwe

South America

Argentina, Brazil, Colombia, Ecuador, Paraguay

North America

Canada, El Salvador, Guatemala, Jamaica, Mexico, Trinidad and Tobago, United States

Asia

Afghanistan, Bangladesh, Burma (Myanmar), Cambodia, China, India, Indonesia, Japan, Jordan, Malaysia, Mongolia, Nepal, Philippines, Singapore, Syria, Thailand, Turkey

Europe

Austria, France, Germany, Ireland, Italy, Norway, Spain, United Kingdom


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of GC3. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
GC Aid
GC Assist
Global Connections In Mission

Purpose & Structure


Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief

Religious groups

Children / young people, Other charities, People with disabilities, Migrants / refugees

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Ian Joseph McBride Trustee 17/11/2018
Rachel Vivian Woodfield Trustee 17/11/2018
Rebecca Elizabeth de Jong Trustee 17/11/2018
Rebekah Louise Opie Trustee 25/11/2017
Christopher Graeme Bailey Trustee 18/03/2017
John Donald Barris Trustee 18/03/2017
Emma Catherine Stokes Trustee 14/07/2012
Bruce William Stormer Trustee 3/03/2012
Christopher George Franklyn Trustee 16/07/2011
Karen June Brookes Trustee 1/03/2002
loading image for pagination

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Lynette May Stark Trustee 25/09/2023
David John Cantwell Trustee 19/03/2022
Richard Sefton Marshall Trustee 19/03/2022
Christopher Douglas Harrison Hill Trustee 21/03/2020
Russell John Thorp Trustee 21/03/2020
Valerie Animoa Goold Trustee 21/03/2020
Graham Duncan Fletcher Trustee 9/03/2019
Murray Sinclair Stevenson Trustee 2/04/2016
Russell William Embling Trustee 4/02/2014
John Edward Hodgkinson Trustee 17/11/2012
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
14/05/2024 NOC027
2/10/2023 NOC026
25/03/2022 NOC025
17/04/2020 NOC023
26/09/2019 NOC022
25/03/2019 NOC021
21/03/2019 NOC020
21/03/2019 NOC019
18/04/2017 NOC018
18/04/2017 NOC017
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.