Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Group Summary


Group Members


Below are all the members of GC3.

The group owner is required to complete a consolidated annual return on behalf of its members. Consolidated annual return information for these members is available in the Annual Returns tab below.

Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
GC Aid
GC Assist
Global Connections In Mission

Group Details


GC3

Registration details

Registered
28/06/2016
CC53474
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 744
Palmerston North Central
Palmerston North
4440
Level Two
Capital Fund House
357 Main Street
Palmerston North
4410

Group's other details

06 882 9501

Oceania

Fiji, Micronesia, Papua New Guinea, Samoa, Solomon Islands, Tonga, Tuvalu, Vanuatu

Africa

Angola, Botswana, Cameroon, Central African Republic, Chad, Congo, Congo, Democratic Republic of, Ethiopia, Kenya, Liberia, Mozambique, Niger, Nigeria, South Africa, Uganda, Zambia, Zimbabwe

South America

Argentina, Brazil, Colombia, Ecuador, Paraguay

North America

Canada, El Salvador, Guatemala, Jamaica, Mexico, Nicaragua, Trinidad and Tobago, United States

Asia

Afghanistan, Burma (Myanmar), Cambodia, India, Indonesia, Israel, Japan, Jordan, Malaysia, Mongolia, Nepal, Philippines, Singapore, Syria, Thailand, Turkey

Europe

Austria, France, Germany, Ireland, Italy, Norway, Spain, United Kingdom


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: these Annual Returns contain consolidated financial information for all members of this group.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2023 31/07/2024 24/07/2024 $635,199 $565,996 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 28/06/2023 $541,267 $519,178 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 25/03/2022 $862,316 $474,028 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 22/04/2021 $530,153 $571,712 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 9/06/2020 $638,115 $722,847 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 21/03/2019 $507,892 $694,050 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 20/04/2018 $805,757 $593,623 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 18/04/2017 $874,487 $611,513 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 17/08/2016 $537,168 $649,140 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The mission statement for GC3 is- 'Inspiring, assisting, connecting churches in God's mission'

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Makes grants to organisations (includes schools or other charities), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Economic development

Religious groups

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, People with disabilities, Migrants / refugees, Children / young people

Entity Structure

Put simply, GC3 is the name given to the combined activity of all three trusts in this group. Global Connections in Mission provided the $100 capital for the formation of both GC Assist and GC Aid and the Global Connections in Mission Board appoints the trustees to both GC Assist and GC Aid from within its members. All three trusts have different purposes but all contribute to the common ethos and the general charitable purposes of Global Connections in mission.

Group Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this group.

Group Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No group documents.