Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Group Summary


Group Members


Below are all the members of ChildFund NZ Ltd & Subsidiaries.

The group owner is required to complete a consolidated annual return on behalf of its members. Consolidated annual return information for these members is available in the Annual Returns tab below.

Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
ChildFund New Zealand Limited
SDG Impacts Limited

Group Details


ChildFund NZ Ltd & Subsidiaries

Registration details

Registered
5/10/2022
CC60582
June 30

Address for service

2 Kitchener Street
Auckland Central
Auckland
1010

Group's other details

(09)3660333

Oceania

Kiribati, Papua New Guinea, Solomon Islands

Africa

Kenya, Zambia

Asia

East Timor, Sri Lanka, Vietnam


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: these Annual Returns contain consolidated financial information for all members of this group.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 25/11/2024 $11,004,501 $10,843,150 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 16/02/2024 $11,530,353 $11,391,849 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 22/11/2022 $10,295,000 $10,096,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Children development and welfare

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Makes grants to organisations (includes schools or other charities), Provides advice / information / advocacy

International activities

Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Fund-raising

Children / young people

Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities

Entity Structure

Parent and 100% owned subsidiary

Group Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this group.

Group Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No group documents.