Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


SDG Impacts Limited
CC59339
N/A
Registered

Registration details

28/06/2021
June 30

Address for service

Level 9
2 Kitchener Street
Auckland Central
Auckland
1010

Charity's other details


Oceania

Kiribati, Papua New Guinea, Solomon Islands

Africa

Kenya, Zambia

Asia

East Timor, Sri Lanka, Vietnam


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:


Group Members


Below are all the members of ChildFund NZ Ltd & Subsidiaries. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
ChildFund New Zealand Limited
SDG Impacts Limited

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

We enable children and youth to thrive

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Fund-raising

Other charities

Legal Structure


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 Member of 'ChildFund NZ Ltd & Subsidiaries' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 Member of 'ChildFund NZ Ltd & Subsidiaries' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 Member of '' group - click here to view Annual Return

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Colleen Woodcock Finance Manager 1/06/2021

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Janice Wong CFO 5/08/2022

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
7/09/2022 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.