Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


ChildFund New Zealand Limited
CC10081
9429039225627
Registered

Registration details

18/03/2007
June 30

Address for service

2 Kitchener Street
Auckland Central
Auckland
1010

Charity's other details

(09)3660333

Oceania

Kiribati, Papua New Guinea, Solomon Islands

Africa

Kenya, Zambia

Asia

East Timor, Sri Lanka, Vietnam


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:


Group Members


Below are all the members of ChildFund NZ Ltd & Subsidiaries. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
ChildFund New Zealand Limited
SDG Impacts Limited

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

We enable children and youth to thrive

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Providing Assistance to Needy Children and Communities), Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy

International activities

Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Social services, Fund-raising, Child focussed Community Development

Children / young people

Voluntary bodies other than charities, Needy Children and Communities

Legal Structure

Company

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Childfund Kiribati (Non-Registered Entity) N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 Member of 'ChildFund NZ Ltd & Subsidiaries' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 Member of 'ChildFund NZ Ltd & Subsidiaries' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 Member of '' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 11/01/2022 $12,640,000 $11,744,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 16/10/2020 $11,267,000 $11,098,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 15/11/2019 $11,290,000 $11,340,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 28/06/2019 $13,885,000 $13,217,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 6/03/2018 $15,199,000 $15,051,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 29/08/2016 $15,013,258 $14,261,263 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 15/09/2015 $15,291,197 $15,175,544 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Peata Williams Director 11/12/2024
Samuelu Sefuiva Director 21/08/2024
Jay Stead Chair 9/07/2021
Michele Teague Director 9/07/2021
Poohan Nathan Director 9/07/2021
Francis Davy Director 4/01/2021
Ruby Anushiya Ponniah Director 7/11/2019

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Simon Douglas Whyte Chair 25/02/2025
Janet O'Connor Director 11/08/2023
Binu Paul Director 24/04/2023
Alastair de Raadt Director 21/11/2021
Michael Vinesh Prasad Director 21/11/2021
Eve Jolly Director 30/06/2020
John Holley Director 30/06/2020
Natasha Maria Lewis Director 19/03/2019
Sean Triner Director 30/09/2017
Geoff Robert Copstick Director 30/06/2017
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
17/04/2025 NOC048
13/01/2025 NOC047
21/11/2023 NOC044
28/06/2023 NOC043
18/10/2022 NOC041
7/09/2022 NOC040
18/08/2022 NOC039
16/12/2019 NOC036
15/11/2019 NOC035
8/03/2018 NOC032
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.