Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


National Council of Women of New Zealand Incorporated
Te Kaunihera Wāhine o Aotearoa
CC49050
9429042769286
Registered

Registration details

19/08/2010
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 3817
Pipitea
Wellington
6140
Level 4
Central House 26 Brandon Street
Wellington Central
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

0226556512
www.facebook.com/ncwnz.org.nz/
https://www.linkedin.com/company/national-council-of-women-of-new-zealand/


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of NCWNZ National Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
National Council of Women Dunedin Branch
National Council of Women Manawatu Branch
National Council of Women Nelson Branch
National Council Of Women New Zealand Wellington Branch
National Council Of Women NZ Christchurch Branch
National Council of Women of New Zealand Incorporated
National Council Of Women Of New Zealand Wanganui Branch Incorporated
National Council Of Women Southland Branch

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

1. Serve women, the family and the community at the local, national and international level; 2. Research the needs of women and the family; 3. Engage in education for women, that helps in to advance women, the family and the community; 4. Collect and redistribute information of service to the community; 5. Maintain links with the National Councils of Women in other countries through the International Council of Women; and 6. Do anything incidental or conducive to the attainment of any of the above objects.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds)

Education / training / research

Community development

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Older people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau

Legal Structure

Incorporated Society

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 Member of 'NCWNZ National Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 Member of 'NCWNZ National Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 Member of 'NCWNZ National Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 Member of 'NCWNZ National Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 Member of 'NCWNZ National Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 Member of 'NCWNZ National Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/03/2019 31/10/2019 Member of 'NCWNZ National Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 Member of '' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 28/09/2017 $152,071 $475,939 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 29/09/2016 $284,816 $277,499 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Katie Thomas Board member 23/09/2023
Anmar Taufeek Board Member 19/02/2022
Kerri Du Pont Board member 5/07/2021
Suzanne Louise Manning President 30/09/2019

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Carol Beaumont Board member 5/10/2024
Jean Nuku Board member 30/04/2024
Betty Ofe Grant Board member 31/01/2024
Nina Santos Aspiring Board Member 23/09/2023
Neesha Morar Board member 19/02/2022
Lisa Lawrence Board Member 31/05/2021
Phillipa Jamieson Board Member 31/05/2021
Arna-Louise Metcalfe Board Member 28/02/2021
Rachel Harris Board Member 30/09/2020
Vanisa Dhiru President 29/02/2020
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
14/10/2024 NOC033
22/10/2023 NOC032
14/10/2023 NOC031
27/09/2023 NOC030
1/07/2022 NOC029
12/04/2022 NOC028
20/03/2022 NOC027
10/03/2022 NOC026
12/12/2021 NOC025
11/09/2021 NOC024
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.