Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Group Summary


Group Members


Below are all the members of NCWNZ National Group.

The group owner is required to complete a consolidated annual return on behalf of its members. Consolidated annual return information for these members is available in the Annual Returns tab below.

Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
National Council of Women Dunedin Branch
National Council of Women Manawatu Branch
National Council of Women Nelson Branch
National Council Of Women New Zealand Wellington Branch
National Council Of Women NZ Christchurch Branch
National Council of Women of New Zealand Incorporated
National Council Of Women Of New Zealand Wanganui Branch Incorporated
National Council Of Women Southland Branch

Group Details


NCWNZ National Group
National Council of Women of New Zealand Te Kaunihera Wāhine o Aotearoa

Registration details

Registered
20/04/2018
CC55358
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 3817
Pipitea
Wellington
6140
Level 4
Central House 26 Brandon Street
Wellington Central
Wellington
6011

Group's other details

0226556512


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: these Annual Returns contain consolidated financial information for all members of this group.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 7/10/2024 14/10/2024 $145,958 $122,955 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 27/09/2023 $137,650 $139,242 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 31/10/2022 4/12/2022 $163,426 $184,591 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 13/03/2022 20/03/2022 $160,028 $182,639 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 31/12/2021 12/12/2021 $225,757 $271,246 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 23/10/2019 $598,573 $763,859 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 31/12/2018 17/03/2019 $237,598 $557,296 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To build understanding and drive action to enable New Zealanders to have the safety, freedom and opportunity to determine their own sustainable future. We do this to advance the rights of women, their families and communities, and make Gender Equality a Reality in Aotearoa New Zealand.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Education / training / research

General public

Entity Structure

NCWNZ is an Incorporated Society and Registered as a Charity CC49050, and consists of a membership base and an elected Board. Members include 13 branches throughout the country, affiliated organisations and those who join directly in accordance with the NCWNZ Constitution (version 2021). Branches run autonomously according to their own bylaws.

Group Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this group.

Group Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No group documents.