Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


National Council Of Women Southland Branch
National Council of Women Southland
CC41338
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

Flat 19
90 Conon Street
Appleby
Invercargill
9812

Charity's other details

021 136 6714


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of NCWNZ National Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
National Council of Women Dunedin Branch
National Council of Women Manawatu Branch
National Council of Women Nelson Branch
National Council Of Women New Zealand Wellington Branch
National Council Of Women NZ Christchurch Branch
National Council of Women of New Zealand Incorporated
National Council Of Women Of New Zealand Wanganui Branch Incorporated
National Council Of Women Southland Branch

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Southland branch of the National Council of Women

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Education / training / research

Accommodation / housing, Health, Environment / conservation, Community development, Social services, Employment, International activities, Economic development, Promotion of volunteering

Children / young people

Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, Women, Children, Young People

Legal Structure

Incorporated Society

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 Member of 'NCWNZ National Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 Member of 'NCWNZ National Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 Member of 'NCWNZ National Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 Member of 'NCWNZ National Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 Member of 'NCWNZ National Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 Member of 'NCWNZ National Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 Member of 'NCWNZ National Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 Member of '' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 10/04/2018 $6,409 $5,303 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 10/02/2017 $5,957 $4,818 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Lynn-Marie Gwenneth Devery President 13/06/2024
Margaret Gwenneth Cook Secretary 13/06/2024
Patrica Helen Marshall Executive Member 31/07/2023
Wendy Creurer Treasurer 13/06/2023

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Rebecca Rae Amundsen member 29/10/2024
Janette Gellatley Secretary 13/06/2024
Anne Elizabeth McCracken Executive Member 31/07/2023
Kaye Janice Crowther Executive Member 31/07/2023
Lynn-Marie Devery Executive Member 31/07/2023
Margaret Cook Executive Member 31/07/2023
Vanya Ives Bailey Executive Member 31/07/2023
Bev Chesney TREASURER 13/06/2023
Jan Hibbs Secretary 13/06/2023
Raewyn Margaret Benzie Secretary 11/05/2021
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
29/10/2024 NOC019
23/10/2024 NOC018
11/12/2023 NOC016
17/06/2023 NOC015
17/06/2023 NOC014
14/05/2021 NOC013
4/12/2020 NOC012
4/12/2020 NOC011
16/09/2015 NOC008
8/09/2014 NOC007
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.