Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Trade Aid New Zealand Incorporated
CC21379
9429042976585
Registered

Registration details

25/02/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 35049
Shirley
Christchurch
8640
174 Gayhurst Road
Dallington
Christchurch
8061

Charity's other details

03 385 3535
03 385 3536


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Trade Aid. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Sweet Justice Limited
Trade Aid Importers Limited
Trade Aid New Zealand Incorporated

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To educate New Zealanders within New Zealand about the nature of poverty and the need for fair trading conditions

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides advice / information / advocacy

Other (please state)

(To educate New Zealanders within New Zealand about the nature of poverty and the need for fair trading conditions), Education / training / research, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Legal Structure

Incorporated Society

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Auckland Central Trade Aid Trust CC20431
Feilding Trade Aid Trust CC20533
Masterton Trade Aid Society Inc CC20430
Napier Trade Aid Trust CC20748
Nelson Trade Aid Trust CC20566
Oamaru Trade Aid Trust CC20448
Petone Trade Aid Trust CC22016
Ponsonby Trade Aid Trust CC20432
Sweet Justice Limited CC50502
Takapuna Trade Aid Charitable Trust CC20392
Taupo Trade Aid Trust CC20395
Tauranga Trade Aid Centre Trust CC21338
Te Awamutu Trade Aid Shop CC23031
The Picton Trade Aid Trust CC21336
Third World Trust (Manawatu) CC21383
Timaru Trade Aid Trust CC20329
Trade Aid (Tairawhiti) Charitable Trust CC20476
Trade Aid Christchurch Trust CC29586
Trade Aid Dunedin Trust CC20492
Trade Aid Howick Owairoa Charitable Trust CC20441
Trade Aid Importers Limited CC26394
Trade Aid Pukekohe Trust CC52137
Trade Aid Rotorua Trust CC20464
Trade Aid Trust of New Plymouth CC21059
Wellington Trade Aid Trust CC20532
Westcity Trade Aid Trust CC20530
Whaingaroa Trade Aid Trust CC21393
Whangarei Trade Aid Charitable Trust CC20502

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 Member of 'Trade Aid' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 Member of 'Trade Aid' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 Member of 'Trade Aid' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 Member of 'Trade Aid' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 Member of 'Trade Aid' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 Member of 'Trade Aid' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 Member of 'Trade Aid' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 12/12/2017 $20,685,000 $20,813,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 29/12/2016 $20,909,000 $20,760,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 18/12/2015 $34,000 $34,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Donald Cameron McIntosh Trustee 10/09/2023
Scarlett Clare Vowden Trustee 10/09/2023
Rachel Clare Chapman Trustee 8/12/2021
Alyson Chandler Trustee 1/01/2020
David Rose Trustee 2/12/2016
Lyn Jackson Trustee 26/02/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Melanie Burke Trustee 30/06/2024
Michelia Miles Trustee 30/06/2024
Elizabeth Pishief Trustee 30/09/2023
Lisa McCready Trustee 30/04/2022
Christopher Dale Trustee 30/09/2021
Joanne Palmer Trustee 31/07/2021
Pam Dowd Trustee 20/11/2020
Averil Ferbert Trustee 10/07/2020
Amanda Reid Trustee 31/12/2019
Anna Pallesen Trustee 31/12/2019
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
17/12/2021 NOC019
26/11/2020 NOC018
19/12/2019 NOC017
21/02/2018 NOC016
27/03/2015 NOC013
19/09/2013 NOC008
19/09/2013 NOC007
16/09/2013 AR006
11/09/2013 NOC006
6/12/2012 NOC005
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.