Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Group Summary


Group Members


Below are all the members of Trade Aid.

The group owner is required to complete a consolidated annual return on behalf of its members. Consolidated annual return information for these members is available in the Annual Returns tab below.

Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Sweet Justice Limited
Trade Aid Importers Limited
Trade Aid New Zealand Incorporated

Group Details


Trade Aid

Registration details

Registered
16/05/2018
CC55400
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 35049
Shirley
Christchurch
8640
174 Gayhurst Road
Dallington
Christchurch
8061

Group's other details

03 385 3535
03 385 3536


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: these Annual Returns contain consolidated financial information for all members of this group.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 17/02/2025 $26,783,000 $28,006,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 20/12/2023 $25,021,000 $26,268,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 28/12/2022 $24,636,000 $24,466,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 17/12/2021 $23,187,000 $22,840,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 30/12/2020 $20,417,000 $21,522,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 19/12/2019 $21,918,000 $22,040,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 18/12/2018 $20,667,000 $20,699,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

A. To educate New Zealanders with New Zealand about the nature of poverty and the need for fair trading conditions B. To carry on any further charitable object which may seem to the Directors capable of being conveniently carried on in connection with the above objects of calculated directly or indirectly to advance the charitable objects of the Society or any of them.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Makes grants to organisations (includes schools or other charities), Provides advice / information / advocacy

Education / training / research

Employment, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Entity Structure

Incorporated Society which owns a company which owns another company.

Group Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this group.

Group Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No group documents.