Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Trade Aid Importers Limited
CC26394
9429040327327
Registered

Registration details

22/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 35049
Shirley
Christchurch
8640
174 Gayhurst Road
Dallington
Christchurch
8061

Charity's other details

(03)3853535
(03)3853536


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Trade Aid. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Sweet Justice Limited
Trade Aid Importers Limited
Trade Aid New Zealand Incorporated

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The primary objects of the company shall be limited to those as classified as charitable within New Zealand and in particular: - To educate New Zealanders within New Zealand about the nature of poverty and the need for fair trading conditions - To carry on any other charitable object which may seem to the Board capable of being conveniently carried on in connection with the above objects or calculated directly or indirectly to advance the charitable objects of the Society or any of them.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Importation & wholesale at crafts & commodities from disadvantaged third world producers

Other (please state)

(To educate New Zealanders within New Zealand about the nature of poverty and the need for fair trading conditions), Education / training / research, Employment, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Legal Structure

Company

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Trade Aid Kapiti Trust CC52539
Trade Aid New Zealand Incorporated

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 Member of 'Trade Aid' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 Member of 'Trade Aid' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 Member of 'Trade Aid' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 Member of 'Trade Aid' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 Member of 'Trade Aid' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 Member of 'Trade Aid' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 Member of 'Trade Aid' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 10/12/2017 $19,913,000 $20,147,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 29/12/2016 $20,909,000 $20,760,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 22/12/2015 $17,598,415 $17,315,756 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Julian Shane Daly Director 1/11/2021
Melanie Jane Mary Matthews Director 1/11/2021
Dennis Frank Parker Director 2/10/2019
Melanie Lynn Director 21/05/2018
Doug Spence Director 24/11/2015
Christopher Knowles Director 23/06/2008
Geoffrey Angus Director 23/06/2008
Lynette Jackson Chair 23/06/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Joanna Frances Matheson Director 30/06/2022
Margaret Court Trustee 15/04/2021
Vi Cottrell Director 31/12/2019
Kevin Searle Director 1/10/2017
Warren Goddard Director 24/11/2014
Christian Pilkington Director 12/12/2013

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
17/12/2021 NOC011
22/12/2015 NOC007
19/12/2014 NOC006
23/04/2014 NOC005
13/11/2012 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.