Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Group Summary


Group Members


Below are all the members of Hugo Charitable Trust Group.

The group owner is required to complete a consolidated annual return on behalf of its members. Consolidated annual return information for these members is available in the Annual Returns tab below.

Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Hugo Charitable Trust
Hugo Charitable Trust Limited
Hugo Limited

Group Details


Hugo Charitable Trust Group

Registration details

Registered
3/06/2020
CC57747
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 103
Arrowtown
9351
93 Arrowtown-Lake Hayes Road
Lake Hayes
9371

Group's other details

+64274242503


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: these Annual Returns contain consolidated financial information for all members of this group.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 15/05/2025 $4,549,528 $2,639,014 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 7/05/2024 $6,923,687 $1,635,869 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 10/05/2023 $3,215,213 $1,420,179 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 6/05/2022 $2,380,076 $2,580,146 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 14/05/2021 $2,496,996 $2,001,215 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 15/06/2020 $4,239,985 $4,649,590 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Make donations to organisations (including schools or other charities) and individuals covering every charitable purpose, whether the relief of poverty, the advancement of education or religion, or any other matter beneficial to the community.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (includes schools or other charities), Sponsors / undertakes research

Health

Education / training / research, Social services, Disability

Other charities

Children / young people, General public, Family / whanau, Children / young people

Entity Structure

Hugo Charitable Trust, the Group's parent, is responsible for deciding on and making all donations to organisations (including schools or other charities) and individuals. Hugo Charitable Trust's subsidiary companies, Hugo Charitable Trust Limited & Hugo Limited, are active with property and financial investments to generate adequate returns on the Group's capital base to provide the funds for donations to be paid out.

Group Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this group.

Group Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No group documents.