Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Group Summary


Group Members


Below are all the members of NZ Heart Foundation.

The group owner is required to complete a consolidated annual return on behalf of its members. Consolidated annual return information for these members is available in the Annual Returns tab below.

Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Heart Health Research Trust
National Heart Foundation Of New Zealand
Trust for the Chair in Cardiovascular Studies

Group Details


NZ Heart Foundation
Heart Foundation

Registration details

Registered
15/08/2012
CC48057
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 17160
Greenlane
Auckland
1546
9 Kalmia Street
Ellerslie
Auckland
1051

Group's other details

095719191


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: these Annual Returns contain consolidated financial information for all members of this group.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 21/11/2024 $40,990,000 $37,173,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 23/11/2023 $35,590,000 $34,152,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 24/11/2022 $28,609,000 $34,592,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 18/11/2021 $34,165,000 $31,124,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 26/11/2020 $26,408,000 $26,494,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 27/11/2019 $25,162,000 $24,980,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 23/11/2018 $24,414,000 $23,351,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 24/11/2017 $22,950,000 $21,923,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 7/12/2016 $24,439,473 $22,791,878 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 7/12/2015 $22,175,739 $21,506,275 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To stop New Zealanders dying prematurely from heart disease and to help those with heart disease to live full and productive lives

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Makes research Grants and provides health services)

Health

Education / training / research

General public

Children / young people, Children / young people

Entity Structure

The Foundation is a charitable trust with a National Office based in Auckland and other locations throughout New Zealand. The Foundation is governed by a Board of Directors.

Group Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the group, for example, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
10/04/2019 NOC004

Group Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No group documents.