Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Heart Health Research Trust
CC43657
9429043225873
Registered

Registration details

22/02/2010
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 17160
Greenlane
Auckland
1546
9 Kalmia Street
Ellerslie
Auckland
1051

Charity's other details

09 5719181


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of NZ Heart Foundation. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Heart Health Research Trust
National Heart Foundation Of New Zealand
Trust for the Chair in Cardiovascular Studies

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The purpose of the Trust is to provide funding for new preventative heart health research and to establish and support a university-based research hub for heart health research.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Sponsors / undertakes research

Education / training / research

Health

General public

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2010 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2011.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Clive Martin Nelson Trustee 5/08/2019
Gerard Patrick Devlin Trustee 1/08/2014
Faye Sumner Trustee 16/05/2013
Michael Thomas Tomlinson Trustee 21/01/2010

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Malcolm Erskine Legget Trustee 1/11/2024
Jennifer Mary Shipley Trustee 30/06/2021
Anthony James Duncan Trustee 12/04/2019
Michael Murray Benjamin Trustee 30/05/2018
Mervyn John Merrilees Trustee 24/11/2016
David Norman Sharpe Trustee 30/04/2014
Norma Jean Restieaux Trustee 28/02/2013

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
3/09/2019 NOC015
10/04/2019 NOC013
7/12/2016 NOC010
8/08/2014 NOC008
16/06/2014 NOC007
24/02/2014 NOC006
24/05/2013 NOC005
16/04/2013 NOC004
26/03/2013 NOC003
16/03/2010 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.