Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Trust for the Chair in Cardiovascular Studies
CC45930
9429043226917
Registered

Registration details

17/12/2010
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 17160
Greenlane
Auckland
1546
9 Kalmia Street
Ellerslie
Auckland
1051

Charity's other details

09 571 9191


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of NZ Heart Foundation. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Heart Health Research Trust
National Heart Foundation Of New Zealand
Trust for the Chair in Cardiovascular Studies

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To establish and support a Chair in Cardiovascular Studies to promote high quality research into heart and blood vessel diseases and related matters in New Zealand and increase the profile of cardiovascular research throughout New Zealand

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Education / training / research

Health

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Older people

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2011 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2012.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Clive Martin Nelson Trustee 5/08/2019
Gerard Patrick Devlin Trustee 1/08/2014
Michael Thomas Tomlinson Trustee 17/12/2010

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Anthony James Duncan Trustee 12/04/2019
Michael Murray Benjamin Trustee 30/05/2018
Mervyn Merrilees Trustee 24/11/2016
David Norman Sharpe Trustee 30/04/2014
Norma Restieaux Trustee 30/04/2014
Russell Wood Trustee 30/04/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
3/09/2019 NOC011
10/04/2019 NOC009
7/12/2016 NOC006
2/11/2016 NOC004
8/08/2014 NOC003
16/06/2014 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.