Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Group Summary


Group Members


Below are all the members of McAuley Trust Group.

The group owner is required to complete a consolidated annual return on behalf of its members. Consolidated annual return information for these members is available in the Annual Returns tab below.

Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
McAuley Trust
Mercy Foundation Limited
St Catherine's Rest Home Limited

Group Details


McAuley Trust Group

Registration details

Registered
8/11/2017
CC54900
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 6015
Wellesley Street
Auckland
1141
7 New Street
Saint Marys Bay
Auckland
1011

Group's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: these Annual Returns contain consolidated financial information for all members of this group.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 30/09/2024 $17,031,342 $19,041,385 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 4/09/2023 $8,050,722 $18,674,573 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 22/09/2022 $10,382,093 $13,462,133 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 31/10/2021 29/10/2021 $21,247,344 $13,267,766 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 30/09/2020 $8,772,910 $15,602,862 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 30/09/2019 $13,111,369 $14,160,211 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 25/09/2018 $13,860,665 $14,172,308 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 8/11/2017 $10,016,834 $13,154,667 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Manages the property and assets for the the Nga Whaea Atawhai o Aotearoa Sisters of Mercy New Zealand, a Catholic religious congregation of vowed women.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (includes schools or other charities), Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Social services, Arts / culture / heritage

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Older people, People with disabilities, Migrants / refugees, Religious groups, Children / young people

Entity Structure

McAuley Trust main office located in Auckland with three other members in the group based nationwide that are all separately registered charities. McAuley Trust has six board members and five trustees.

Group Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the group, for example, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
22/09/2022 NOC007

Group Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No group documents.