Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


McAuley Trust
CC24677
9429043054329
Registered

Registration details

21/05/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 6015
Wellesley Street
Auckland
1141
7 New Street
Saint Marys Bay
Auckland
1011

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of McAuley Trust Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
McAuley Trust
Mercy Foundation Limited
St Catherine's Rest Home Limited

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The purpose of the Trust is to manage the property and assets for the Nga Whaea Atawhai o Aoteaoroa Sister of Mercy New Zealand. These assets are held to fund the congregations charitable work to serve people in need of education, healthcare and social services.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Social services

Education / training / research, Religious activities

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Migrants / refugees

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Mercy Foundation Limited CC38425

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30th of September 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by the 30 of September 2009.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 Member of 'McAuley Trust Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 Member of 'McAuley Trust Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 Member of 'McAuley Trust Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 Member of 'McAuley Trust Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 Member of 'McAuley Trust Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 Member of 'McAuley Trust Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 Member of 'McAuley Trust Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 Member of 'McAuley Trust Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 25/09/2017 $10,016,834 $13,154,667 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 28/09/2016 $10,630,138 $12,645,450 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Denise Margaret Fox Trustee 5/12/2024
Kathleen Patricia Lynch Trustee 5/12/2024
Margaret Anne Martin Trustee 5/12/2024
Natalie Mary Murphy Trustee 5/12/2024
Paula Anamani Alipia Trustee 5/12/2024

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Judith Patricia Moroney Trustee 5/12/2024
Kilistina Tupou Maliu'oehau Vaeatangitau Trustee 5/12/2024
Mary Bernadette Wood Trustee 5/12/2024
Raylene Anne Dwyer Trustee 5/12/2024
Susan Jayne France Trustee 5/12/2024
Katrina Fabish Trustee 12/12/2019
Tui Heather Louise Cadigan Trustee 12/12/2019
Anne Pauline Campbell Trustee 12/12/2014
Mary Frances Catherwood Trustee 12/12/2014
Natalie Mary Murphy Trustee 12/12/2014
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
5/02/2025 NOC012
22/09/2022 NOC011
30/01/2020 NOC010
1/10/2015 NOC007
19/12/2014 NOC006
20/09/2011 AR004
29/01/2010 NOC003
25/09/2009 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.