Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


St Catherine's Rest Home Limited
CC31599
9429038757303
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 6015
Wellesley Street
Auckland
1141
St Catherine's Rest Home
9 New Street
Saint Marys Bay
Auckland
1011

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of McAuley Trust Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
McAuley Trust
Mercy Foundation Limited
St Catherine's Rest Home Limited

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Aged care for women

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Provides religious services / activities

Health

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Community development, Social services, Religious activities

Older people

Entity Structure

Managed by Board

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Peter Neven Director 29/04/2015
Susan Jayne France Director 13/12/2009

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Francis Horton Tuck Director 15/04/2020
Anne Pauline Campbell Director 31/12/2015
Reuben William O' Neill Director 31/12/2015
Rita Joan Vessey Director 31/12/2015
Patricia Rowe Director 29/04/2015
Denise Margaret Fox Director 19/02/2010
Katrina Fabish Director 13/12/2009
Pauline Frances Engel Director 31/07/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
24/09/2018 NOC010
28/09/2017 NOC008
29/09/2016 NOC006
29/09/2016 NOC005
25/02/2010 NOC003
10/09/2009 NOC002

Charity Documents


Notices

This entity was removed from a single entity group (CC31478) on 4 October 2017.

load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.