Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Pathway Affordable Housing Limited
CC62072
N/A
Registered

Registration details

21/11/2023
March 31

Address for service

44 Mandeville Street
Riccarton
Christchurch
8011

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Pathway Charitable Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Motukarara Camp Incorporated
Pathway Affordable Housing Limited
Pathway Engineering Limited
Pathway Trust

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To own and maintain community housing projects that provide housing to those who are poor, disadvantages, or would otherwise be unable to afford housing.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Accommodation / housing

Education / training / research

General public

Legal Structure

Company

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 Member of 'Pathway Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 Member of '' group - click here to view Annual Return

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
David Mortimer Director 21/11/2023
Kirsten Alexandra Billcliff Director 4/10/2021
Murray Alan Kennedy Director 28/09/2020
Matthew Paul Gray Director 3/03/2020

Charity Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this charity.

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.