Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Pathway Engineering Limited
CC39493
9429037753702
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

44 Mandeville Street
Riccarton
Christchurch
8011

Charity's other details

033494065
033494066


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Pathway Charitable Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Motukarara Camp Incorporated
Pathway Affordable Housing Limited
Pathway Engineering Limited
Pathway Trust

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Yes. we give people a fresh start. It's what we do and we love doing it. People needing employment or new skills, families or individuals needing accommodation and people being released from prison come to us to help them make a fresh start.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Employs and trains the low skilled), Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Employment

Social services, People with disabilities

Other charities

Children / young people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Steve Jukes Director 1/04/2017
Murray Allan Kennedy Director 8/10/1998

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Matthew Gray Trustee 30/11/2023
Victor Tan Trustee 1/01/1999

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
3/06/2014 NOC006
24/01/2012 AR004
13/09/2010 AR003
26/01/2010 NOC002
17/08/2009 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.