Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Motukarara Camp Incorporated
CC37597
9429042750260
Registered

Registration details

10/02/2009
March 31

Address for service

44 Mandeville Street
Riccarton
Christchurch
8011

Charity's other details

03 9821952


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Pathway Charitable Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Motukarara Camp Incorporated
Pathway Affordable Housing Limited
Pathway Engineering Limited
Pathway Trust

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Advance the Evangelical Christian Faith by means of Preaching the Gospel, Christian teaching and exhortation.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Accommodation / housing

Social services

Family / whanau

Children / young people, Migrants / refugees, poor and disadvantaged people

Entity Structure

Incorporated Society with Charitable Status.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 September 2009 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 September 2010.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 Member of 'Pathway Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 Member of 'Pathway Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 Member of 'Pathway Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 Member of 'Pathway Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/03/2021 30/11/2021 28/09/2022 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 15/10/2020 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 30/09/2019 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 30/07/2018 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 30/07/2018 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 30/07/2018 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Murray Allan Kennedy Officer 5/12/2005

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
15/08/2012 AR004
21/09/2011 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.