Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The YMCA, New Zealand Soldiers Great War Memorial Trust
CC54733
N/A
Registered

Registration details

21/08/2017
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 38240
Wellington Mail Centre
Petone
Lower Hutt
5045
Pelorus Trust Sports House
93 Hutt Park Road
Moera
Lower Hutt
5010

Charity's other details

045689622
https://www.facebook.com/YMCANewZealand/


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of YMCANZ incl Foundation and Great War Trusts. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
National Council of YMCAs of New Zealand Incorporated
The YMCA, New Zealand Soldiers Great War Memorial Trust
YMCA Foundation

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Use the capital and income of the trust for the use and purposes of the YMCA in a manner that recognises the work of the New Zealand branch of the YMCA during the Great War in accordance with the Trustee powers set out in clause 6 hereof. However, should it become possible, practicable and expedient for the purpose of the Original Trust Deed to be fulfilled, the Trustees may endeavour to realise this purpose.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants / loans to individuals

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Education / training / research

Religious activities

Children / young people

General public

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Paul Dalton Secretary General 13/05/2024
Byron Hugh O'Neill Trustee 23/01/2024
Shona Hazel Ballinger Trustee 23/01/2024
David Oliver Jones Trustee 11/06/2023
Paul Martin Yallop Trustee 11/06/2023
Kari Ann Graber Trustee 22/05/2022
Bridget-Mary McGown Trustee 16/10/2021

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Wee Li Cheong Board Director 23/01/2024
Callum James Clark Board Director 11/06/2023
Eileen Ann Basher Board Member 11/06/2023
Jennifer Marjorie Kaueli Beatson Board Director 7/06/2022
Matthew James Roberts Board Member 22/05/2022
Paul Martin Yallop Board Director 22/05/2022
Richard Wynyard Handley Board Director 22/05/2022
Stephen Edward Clarke Board Member 30/11/2021
Hannah Dunlop Board member 23/05/2021
Helen Jean McEwan Board Member 23/05/2021
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
26/07/2024 NOC019
19/03/2024 NOC017
20/06/2022 NOC015
24/03/2022 NOC012
10/12/2021 NOC011
8/10/2021 NOC010
8/10/2020 NOC008
6/10/2020 NOC007
30/04/2018 NOC003
30/04/2018 NOC002
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.