Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Group Summary


Group Members


Below are all the members of YMCANZ incl Foundation and Great War Trusts.

The group owner is required to complete a consolidated annual return on behalf of its members. Consolidated annual return information for these members is available in the Annual Returns tab below.

Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
National Council of YMCAs of New Zealand Incorporated
The YMCA, New Zealand Soldiers Great War Memorial Trust
YMCA Foundation

Group Details


YMCANZ incl Foundation and Great War Trusts

Registration details

Registered
8/09/2017
CC54771
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 38240
Wellington Mail Centre
Petone
Lower Hutt
5045
93 Hutt Park Road
191 Thorndon Quay
Moera
Lower Hutt
5010

Group's other details

(04)5689622


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: these Annual Returns contain consolidated financial information for all members of this group.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 17/05/2024 $4,799,578 $4,850,509 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 7/08/2023 9/08/2023 $3,312,145 $3,397,965 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 2/06/2022 $3,832,144 $3,465,228 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 1/07/2021 $3,623,020 $4,076,547 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/09/2020 8/10/2020 $3,518,029 $3,727,882 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2019 31/07/2019 24/06/2019 $4,459,762 $4,305,641 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2018 31/07/2018 7/08/2018 $5,311,327 $5,169,817 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Advancement of education & religion by performing its objects incl encouraging the search for deeper understanding of Christian values in everyday life by being a Christian, ecumenical, voluntary movement for women & men, developing communities in which people care for & support each other & work together for justice, freedom, peace, youth development, promoting healthy living & social responsibility incl by literacy, numeracy, & vocational training international exchange & adventure centres

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Makes grants to organisations (includes schools or other charities), Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Provides religious services / activities

Community development

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Religious activities, Sport / recreation, International activities, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

Family / whanau

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, General public, Migrants / refugees, Children / young people

Entity Structure

Charitable Trusts

Group Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the group, for example, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
18/08/2020 NOC003

Group Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No group documents.