Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


National Council of YMCAs of New Zealand Incorporated
YMCA New Zealand
CC21153
9429042769293
Registered

Registration details

14/02/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 38240
Wellington Mail Centre
Petone
Lower Hutt
5045
93 Hutt Park Road
191 Thorndon Quay
Moera
Lower Hutt
5010

Charity's other details

(04)5689622
https://www.facebook.com/YMCANewZealand/
@YMCANZ


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of YMCANZ incl Foundation and Great War Trusts. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
National Council of YMCAs of New Zealand Incorporated
The YMCA, New Zealand Soldiers Great War Memorial Trust
YMCA Foundation

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Advancement of education & religion by performing its objects including encouraging the search for deeper understanding of Christian values in everyday life by being a Christian, ecumenical, voluntary movement for women & men, developing communities in which people care for & support each other & work together for justice, freedom, peace, youth development, promoting healthy living & social responsibility including by literacy, numeracy, & vocational training international exchange & adventure centres

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Community development

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Sport / recreation, International activities, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

Family / whanau

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, General public, Migrants / refugees

Legal Structure

Incorporated Society

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Paul Dalton Secretary General 13/05/2024
Byron Hugh O'Neill Board Director 23/01/2024
Shona Hazel Ballinger Board Director 23/01/2024
David Oliver Jones Board Director 11/06/2023
Paul Martin Yallop Board Director 11/06/2023
Bridget-Mary McGown Board Director 22/05/2022
Kari Ann Graber Board Director 22/05/2022
Barbara Duley-Foote National Operations Manager 13/09/1999
Maria Buchanan Accountant 14/02/1991

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Wee Li Cheong Board Director 29/01/2024
Callum James Clark Board Director 11/06/2023
Eileen Ann Basher Board Member 11/06/2023
Sean Grenfell McKinley Secretary General 17/06/2022
Jennifer Marjorie Kaueli Beatson Board Director 7/06/2022
Matthew James Roberts Board Member 22/05/2022
Paul Martin Yallop Board Director 22/05/2022
Stephen Edward Clarke Board Director 30/11/2021
Allen Christopher Knol National Chief Executive Officer 2/07/2021
Hannah Dunlop Board Director 23/05/2021
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
18/07/2024 NOC030
16/07/2024 NOC029
25/06/2024 NOC028
18/09/2023 NOC027
9/10/2022 NOC025
20/06/2022 NOC024
2/06/2022 NOC023
24/03/2022 NOC020
1/12/2021 NOC019
30/11/2021 NOC018
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.