Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Age Concern Havelock North Incorporated
CC25095
9429042576181
Registered

Registration details

31/05/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 8733
Havelock North
4157
87 Te Mata Road
Havelock North 4130
Havelock North
4130

Charity's other details

06 877 6488
https://www.facebook.com/ageconcern.havelocknorth


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Age Concern Hawkes Bay Regional. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Age Concern (Flaxmere) Incorporated
Age Concern Havelock North Incorporated
Age Concern Napier Incorporated

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Age Concern Havelock North is a charitable organisation dedicated solely to people over 65.  We are a forward thinking group that provide supportive services that are not available through any other aged sector parties. We promote dignity, wellbeing, equity and respect by providing expert information and supportive services in response to older people's needs. We are active and vocal on relevant issues and work to ensure older people stay connected with their family, friends and community. The over-60s is the fastest-growing group in the country and there are more of us than ever before. Ageing is not an illness, but it can be challenging. At Age Concern we provide the services and support to inspire, enable and support older people. We work collaboratively with others in the aged sector to provide an all-inclusive supportive services provision. Our vision is ambitious. It won’t be easy to get there, and it won’t be a quick journey, but we believe it’s how things should be for older

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Social services

Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Fund-raising, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering, Services for elderly

Older people

People with disabilities, General public, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

The principal object of Age Concern is to benefit the community in Havelock North and the greater Hawkes Bay region by promoting, supporting and enhancing the quality of life, dignity, health, well-being and interests of Older Persons. Age Concern will endeavour to ensure that its work in promoting the principle object is consistent with the principles of the Treaty of Waitangi.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 24/08/2023 $44,046 $20,874 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 24/08/2023 $66,767 $57,719 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 11/10/2021 $106,359 $70,332 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 1/10/2020 $71,329 $80,867 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 13/01/2020 $99,299 $92,894 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 1/04/2019 $101,295 $111,876 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 22/03/2018 $94,091 $101,892 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 2/05/2017 $89,656 $105,885 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Angela Mentzer Board member 17/02/2022
Janet Smith Board Member 11/07/2016
Wayne Bradshaw Chairperson 24/01/2011

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Morag Hill Secretary 6/09/2022
Gail Mulvey Board Member 30/06/2021
Les McIver Board Member 30/09/2019
Brett Feehan Secretary 30/08/2019
Cherry Taylor Board Member 1/09/2016
Martin Hayes Board Member 1/09/2016
Dennis Coon Board Member 6/06/2016
Ross Porter Lange Committee member 31/08/2012
Peter Price Treasurer 31/01/2012
Brookes Belford Board Member 30/11/2010
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
28/10/2022 NOC028
21/02/2022 NOC027
9/03/2020 NOC024
2/10/2019 NOC022
22/07/2019 NOC021
19/05/2016 NOC017
23/03/2016 NOC015
7/05/2015 NOC014
7/05/2015 NOC013
10/11/2014 NOC012
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.