Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Family Success Matters
CC21552
9429041902196
Registered

Registration details

3/03/2008
June 30

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Family Start Manukau 4/03/2008
Family Success Matters 27/04/2018

Address for service

PO Box 76185
Manukau City
Auckland
2241
1 Ash Road
Wiri
Auckland
2104

Charity's other details

(09)2520197
(09)2694671


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Family Success Matters Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Family Success Matters
Fathers for Families Foundation

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Our mission is to enable young families to overcome barriers which prevent their children from enjoying a successful future

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Social services

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Employment

Family / whanau

Children / young people, Migrants / refugees

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 Member of 'Family Success Matters Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 Member of '' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 5/12/2022 $5,419,161 $5,184,323 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 28/02/2022 3/02/2022 $5,398,480 $5,311,576 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 21/12/2020 $5,120,801 $5,002,590 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 22/12/2019 $5,075,045 $4,733,142 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 19/12/2018 $4,805,022 $4,489,713 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 18/12/2017 $4,314,466 $4,077,053 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 9/01/2017 $4,044,205 $3,694,767 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 17/12/2015 $3,938,385 $3,810,847 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Anthony Tumai Trustee 27/07/2018
Enosa Auva’a Trustee 27/07/2018
Martin Ralph Cooper Trustee 27/07/2018
Ted Ngataki Trustee 4/12/2015
Roine Lealaiauloto Trustee 4/03/2008
Ruth Sinclair Trustee 4/03/2008
Colleen Caryll Fakalogotoa CEO 19/09/2005

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Niko Mikaele Toluono Trustee 28/03/2025
Nuku Rapana Trustee 30/10/2020
Anna Bailey Trustee 17/07/2018
Nicola Caunter Trustee 30/06/2018
Adrian Rewha Trustee 27/07/2017
Bill Takerei Trustee 11/05/2017
Colin Mantell Trustee 4/12/2015
Noeline Naus Trustee 4/12/2015
Eru Thompson Trustee 4/11/2014
June Jackson Chairperson 7/03/2014
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
1/05/2025 NOC029
18/10/2023 NOC027
6/10/2023 NOC026
2/11/2020 NOC022
10/08/2018 NOC019
10/08/2018 NOC018
13/07/2018 NOC017
13/07/2018 NOC016
27/04/2018 NOC014
12/05/2017 NOC012
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.