Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Braemar Charitable Trust
CC22668
9429043007172
Registered

Registration details

8/04/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 972
Waikato Mail Centre
Hamilton Central
Hamilton
3240
24 Ohaupo Road
24 Ohaupo Road
Hamilton Lake
Hamilton
3204

Charity's other details

027 2242316
https://www.facebook.com/BraemarTrust
https://www.linkedin.com/company/braemar-charitable-trust


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Braemar Charitable Trust Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Braemar Charitable Trust
Braemar Hospital Limited

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Trusts Charitable Purpose is defined in the Trust Deed as meaning one or more of: (a) the encouragement and furtherance of medical research; (b) the provision and development of, whether directly or through subsidiaries, funding or otherwise, medical facilities in New Zealand, including hospitals, for the treatment of persons; (c) the encouragement of the use of such medical facilities whether by way of provision of medical grants or free or subsidised medical assistance or otherwise; (d) the development of medical knowledge; and (e) such other purposes as are considered charitable under the laws of New Zealand (being purposes which are exempt from income tax in New Zealand).

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Health

Education / training / research

General public

Other charities

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Aidan Mark O'Donnell Medical Trustee 1/09/2023
Vicky Angela McLennan Independent Trustee/Chairperson 1/09/2023
Lu-ana Ngatai Independent Trustee 3/10/2022
Jasen Ly Medical Trustee 1/10/2022
Jason Donovan Medical Trustee 1/10/2022
Kelvyn Eglinton Independent Trustee 2/06/2021
Alan John Goodey Medical Trustee 10/09/2020
Kathryn Ayers Medical Trustee 10/09/2020

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Chris O'Meeghan Medical Trustee 31/08/2023
Victoria Ashplant Lay Trustee 31/08/2023
Ralph van Dalen Medical Trustee 30/09/2022
Robert Carpenter Medical Trustee 30/09/2022
Renae Smart Lay Trustee 31/05/2022
George Bridgewater Lay Trustee 31/03/2021
Adam El-Gamel Medical Trustee 10/09/2020
Ian Dingwall Medical Trustee 2/12/2019
Lionel Max Lamb Lay Trustee 5/09/2018
Maree Anne Stewart Lay Trustee 2/10/2017
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
7/12/2023 NOC053
9/10/2023 NOC052
20/09/2023 NOC050
9/06/2023 NOC049
5/10/2022 NOC045
3/10/2022 NOC044
30/09/2022 NOC043
28/09/2022 NOC042
11/06/2021 NOC040
8/06/2021 NOC039
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.