Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Theosophical Society In New Zealand Inc Trust
CC23314
9429043277438
Registered

Registration details

21/04/2008
September 30

Address for service

18 Belvedere Street
Epsom
Auckland
1051

Charity's other details

09 523 1797


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of The Theosophical Society In New Zealand. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
The Theosophical Society In New Zealand Inc Trust
The Theosophical Society In New Zealand Incorporated

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

As an education based organisation our Mission is to serve humanity by cultivating an ever deepening understanding and realization of the Ageless Wisdom, spiritual self-transformation, and the Unity of all Life.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Fund-raising

Other (please state)

(The Theosophical society in NZ Inc.)

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

The charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 March 2009 under section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 March 2010.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Richard Kenneth Sell National President 13/01/2023
Kelly Seabourne Solicitor 15/01/2016
Clive Conland Trustee 7/01/2012

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Johannes Jacobus Vorstermans National President 13/01/2023
Chris Hubbert Solicitor 15/01/2016
Sandy Ravelli National President 17/01/2014
Richard Sell Trustee 7/01/2012
John T H Jackson Society Solicitor 8/01/2011
Warwick Keys Trustee 8/01/2011

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
19/04/2024 NOC017
24/02/2023 NOC015
27/07/2018 NOC009
14/05/2014 NOC006
27/11/2013 NOC005
28/03/2012 AR005
30/03/2011 AR004
26/03/2010 AR003
25/11/2009 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.