Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The University Of Waikato Research Trust
CC36613
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

Private Bag 3105
Waikato Mail Centre
Hamilton
3240
B BLOCK
5 Hillcrest Road
Hillcrest
Hamilton
3216

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of University of Waikato Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
iEngagEd Limited
The Students Campus Building Fund Trust
The University of Waikato Foundation
The University Of Waikato Research Trust
University Of Waikato

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Trust was set up in December 2007 to provide for the advancement of education and academic research at the University of Waikato.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Sponsors / undertakes research

Research Trust

Other (please state)

(Research Trust), Education / training / research

Other (please state)

(University Of Waikato)

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act
University Of Waikato

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 Member of 'University of Waikato Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 29/06/2023 $1,339,000 $1,923,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 23/06/2022 $3,386,000 $1,863,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 29/06/2021 $1,794,000 $2,210,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 18/06/2020 $2,418,000 $2,109,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 25/06/2019 $2,797,000 $2,256,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 27/06/2018 $2,129,000 $2,052,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 22/06/2017 $1,756,000 $2,334,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 24/06/2016 $1,605,000 $2,598,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2014 30/06/2015 20/05/2015 $1,393,000 $2,111,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
James Frank Eric Mercer Trustee 9/06/2022
Don Albert Klinger Trustee 29/10/2020

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Iain Christopher White Trustee 15/06/2021
Neil Clayton Quigley Trustee 15/06/2021
Simon Lovatt Trustee 15/06/2021
David McCall Trustee 13/05/2020
Mark Apperley Trustee 31/12/2019
Allison Kirkman Trustee 12/10/2019
Duncan George Mackintosh Trustee 31/03/2016
Bruce Clarkson Trustee 1/10/2015
Roy Crawford Trustee 31/12/2014
Alister Jones Trustee 17/08/2011
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
23/06/2022 NOC020
18/06/2020 NOC016
26/04/2017 NOC011
26/04/2017 NOC010
16/03/2017 NOC009
9/03/2017 NOC008
24/06/2016 NOC007
31/03/2015 NOC006
17/10/2011 NOC003
7/05/2010 NOC002
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.