Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Te Pou Matakana Tuararo Limited
CC39141
9429038450464
Registered

Registration details

2/02/2009
June 30

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Learning Post Limited 2/02/2009
Te Pou Matakana Tuarara Limited 13/03/2014

Address for service

PO Box 21081
Henderson
Auckland
650
6 Pioneer Street
Henderson
Auckland
0612

Charity's other details

09 836 6683
09 8384314


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

Focuses on outcomes for Māori, Ownership

Group Members


Below are all the members of Te Whanau o Waipareira Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Housing for Social Benefits Limited
Te Pou Matakana Tuararo Limited
Te Whanau O Waipareira Trust
Wai-Health Limited
Waiora Healthcare Trust
Waipareira Investments Limited
Wai-Tech Limited
Whanau Tahi Limited

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Provide back office services to the West Auckland community providers

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Education and training

Other (please state)

(Back office services)

Other charities

Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Legal Structure

Company

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Moyna Grace Director 8/12/2014
Raymond Hall Director 8/12/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
John Henry Tamihere Director 7/12/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
12/08/2022 NOC013
18/12/2014 NOC005
13/03/2014 NOC004
13/03/2014 NOC003
15/10/2009 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.