Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


iEngagEd Limited
CC50195
9429030085213
Registered

Registration details

29/01/2014
December 31

Address for service

UNIVERSITY OF WAIKATO FINANCIAL SERVICES DIVISION Private Bag 3105
Waikato Mail Centre
Hamilton
3240
University of Waikato
Financial Services Division
Gate 5, Hillcrest Road
Hamilton
3240

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of University of Waikato Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
iEngagEd Limited
The Students Campus Building Fund Trust
The University of Waikato Foundation
The University Of Waikato Research Trust
University Of Waikato

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The company was set up to facilitate and develop opportunities for providing technology-based educational content, tools and products.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Education / training / research

Other charities

Children / young people, General public

Entity Structure

The company is a wholly-owned subsidiary of the University of Waikato.
University Of Waikato

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 Member of 'University of Waikato Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 18/06/2024 $332,559 $443,906 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2023 $368,541 $368,833 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 29/06/2022 $649,630 $596,894 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 28/06/2021 $456,817 $358,791 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 24/06/2020 $436,156 $495,739 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 20/06/2019 $527,569 $430,065 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 21/06/2018 $462,478 $411,844 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2017 $556,293 $461,094 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 27/05/2016 $644,056 $559,973 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
James Frank Eric Mercer Director 1/01/2020
Alister Tukauru Jones Director 5/09/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Andrew Hugh McKinnon Director 31/12/2019

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
14/02/2020 NOC004

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.