Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


St Columba's Parish, Frankton
CC32654
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 5353
Frankton
Hamilton
3242
50 Rifle Range Road
Hamilton East
Dinsdale
Hamilton
3204

Charity's other details

07 856 6989
07 856 7035


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Roman Catholic Bishop Of The Diocese Of Hamilton Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Cathedral Blessed Virgin Mary, Hamilton
Holy Angels Parish, Matamata
Holy Name Parish, Raglan
Immaculate Conception Parish, Taumarunui
Our Lady Of The Sacred Heart Parish, Otorohanga
Parish of St Thomas Aquinas, Tauranga Moana
Roman Catholic Bishop Of The Diocese Of Hamilton
Sacred Heart Syro Malabar Mission Hamilton Parish
St Anthony's Parish, Huntly
St Columba's Parish, Frankton
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Parish is a community of the Christian faithful, called to unite, to reach out in love, to act and transform in Christ.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Social services, Fund-raising, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering

Religious groups

Children / young people, Voluntary bodies other than charities, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

The Code of Canon Law entrusts the care of the Parish to the Parish Priest and Parish Councils, with the trustee being the RC Bishop of Diocese of Hamilton, a corporation sole.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 31/03/2025 $232,700 $359,262 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 17/04/2024 $190,662 $209,369 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 19/06/2023 $211,077 $271,075 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 23/06/2022 $173,284 $208,227 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 1/06/2021 $161,338 $165,647 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 18/06/2020 $173,121 $206,004 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 30/05/2019 $164,508 $147,471 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 22/06/2018 $159,914 $145,810 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 15/06/2017 $160,281 $123,728 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 Member of 'Roman Catholic Bishop Of The Diocese Of Hamilton Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


This charity has no current, past, or disqualified officers.

Charity Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this charity.

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.