Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Holy Angels Parish, Matamata
CC32667
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 4353
Hamilton East
Hamilton
3247
28 Hohaia Street
Matamata 3400
Hamilton
Matamata
3400

Charity's other details

07 856 6989
07 856 7035


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Roman Catholic Bishop Of The Diocese Of Hamilton Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Cathedral Blessed Virgin Mary, Hamilton
Holy Angels Parish, Matamata
Holy Name Parish, Raglan
Immaculate Conception Parish, Taumarunui
Our Lady Of The Sacred Heart Parish, Otorohanga
Parish of St Thomas Aquinas, Tauranga Moana
Roman Catholic Bishop Of The Diocese Of Hamilton
Sacred Heart Syro Malabar Mission Hamilton Parish
St Anthony's Parish, Huntly
St Columba's Parish, Frankton
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Parish is a community of the Christian faithful, called to unite, to reach out in love, to act, and transform in Christ.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Social services, Fund-raising, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering

Religious groups

Children / young people, Voluntary bodies other than charities, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

The Code of Canon Law of the Catholic Church entrusts the care of the Parish to the Parish Priest and Parish Councils. The Roman Catholic Bishops Empowering Act 1997 allows for one Trustee, the RC Bishop of the Diocese of Hamilton, a corporation sole.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 8/08/2024 $95,626 $90,510 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2023 $216,387 $702,636 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2022 $61,487 $60,124 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 22/06/2021 $86,308 $64,069 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 31/08/2020 13/08/2020 $63,790 $63,649 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 19/06/2019 $142,328 $64,210 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 27/06/2018 $76,188 $76,610 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 21/06/2017 $89,675 $69,723 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 Member of 'Roman Catholic Bishop Of The Diocese Of Hamilton Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Roman Catholic Bishop of Hamilton Trustee 24/12/1994

Charity Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this charity.

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.