Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Sacred Heart Syro Malabar Mission Hamilton Parish
CC58729
N/A
Registered

Registration details

12/02/2021
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 4353
Hamilton East
Hamilton
3247
59 Pine Avenue
Melville
Hamilton
3206

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Roman Catholic Bishop Of The Diocese Of Hamilton Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Cathedral Blessed Virgin Mary, Hamilton
Holy Angels Parish, Matamata
Holy Name Parish, Raglan
Immaculate Conception Parish, Taumarunui
Our Lady Of The Sacred Heart Parish, Otorohanga
Parish of St Thomas Aquinas, Tauranga Moana
Roman Catholic Bishop Of The Diocese Of Hamilton
Sacred Heart Syro Malabar Mission Hamilton Parish
St Anthony's Parish, Huntly
St Columba's Parish, Frankton
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Parish is a community of the Christian faithful, called to unite, to reach out in love, to act and transform in Christ.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

Religious groups

Entity Structure

The Code of Canon Law of the Catholic Church entrusts the care of the Parish to the Parish Priest and Parish Councils. The Roman Catholic Bishops Empowering Act 1997 allows for one Trustee, The RC Bishop of the Diocese of Hamilton, a corporation sole.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 7/10/2024 $94,522 $71,341 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 19/11/2023 $90,082 $70,977 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 30/09/2022 $71,464 $57,954 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 - - - - Exempt

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Roman Catholic Bishop of Hamilton Bishop 13/02/2015

Charity Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this charity.

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.