Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Holy Name Parish, Raglan
CC32691
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 35
Raglan
3265
17 James Street
Raglan 3225
Hamilton
Raglan
3225

Charity's other details

07 8566989
07 8567035


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Roman Catholic Bishop Of The Diocese Of Hamilton Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Cathedral Blessed Virgin Mary, Hamilton
Holy Angels Parish, Matamata
Holy Name Parish, Raglan
Immaculate Conception Parish, Taumarunui
Our Lady Of The Sacred Heart Parish, Otorohanga
Parish of St Thomas Aquinas, Tauranga Moana
Roman Catholic Bishop Of The Diocese Of Hamilton
Sacred Heart Syro Malabar Mission Hamilton Parish
St Anthony's Parish, Huntly
St Columba's Parish, Frankton
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Parish is a community of the Christian faithful, called to unite, to reach out in love, to act and transform in Christ.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Social services, Fund-raising, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering

Religious groups

Children / young people, Voluntary bodies other than charities, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

The Code of Canon Law of the Catholic Church entrusts the care of the Parish to the Parish Priest and Parish Councils. The Roman Catholic Bishops Empowering Act 1997 allows for one Trustee, the Bishop of the Diocese of Hamilton, corporation sole.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 8/08/2024 $28,488 $40,259 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 25/08/2023 $25,299 $29,316 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 6/07/2022 $22,195 $20,371 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 3/06/2021 $26,194 $18,250 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 31/08/2020 6/07/2020 $26,060 $27,033 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 14/06/2019 $24,537 $30,245 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 6/06/2018 $22,720 $19,140 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 29/05/2017 $26,558 $24,565 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 Member of 'Roman Catholic Bishop Of The Diocese Of Hamilton Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Roman Catholic Bishop of Hamilton Trustee 24/12/1994

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
3/05/2017 NOC002
3/05/2017 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.