Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Group Summary


Group Members


Below are all the members of The New Zealand Orthopaedic Association Group.

The group owner is required to complete a consolidated annual return on behalf of its members. Consolidated annual return information for these members is available in the Annual Returns tab below.

Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
New Zealand Orthopaedic Association Incorporated
New Zealand Orthopaedic Association Incorporated Trust
New Zealand Orthopaedic Association Joint Registry Trust
The Wishbone Trust

Group Details


The New Zealand Orthopaedic Association Group

Registration details

Registered
30/06/2008
CC43152
July 31

Address for service

PO Box 5545
Pipitea
Wellington
6140
LEVEL 12
39 The Terrace
Wellington Central
Wellington
6011

Group's other details

04 913 9894


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: these Annual Returns contain consolidated financial information for all members of this group.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/07/2024 31/01/2025 14/01/2025 $4,305,374 $2,899,059 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2023 31/01/2024 21/12/2023 $4,216,904 $3,394,894 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2022 31/01/2023 19/01/2023 $2,092,502 $2,000,681 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2021 31/01/2022 12/01/2022 $3,157,912 $2,165,852 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2020 31/01/2021 16/11/2020 $2,304,316 $2,009,570 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2019 31/01/2020 10/10/2019 $3,106,619 $2,335,500 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2018 31/01/2019 5/12/2018 $2,284,630 $2,179,837 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2017 31/01/2018 9/01/2018 $1,825,650 $1,700,720 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2016 31/01/2017 10/01/2017 $2,194,385 $1,905,426 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2015 31/01/2016 2/12/2015 $1,960,720 $1,780,623 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The New Zealand Orthopaedic Association is the professional body representing orthopaedic surgeons in New Zealand with the aim of advancing the quality of orthopaedic practice through training and ongoing education of orthopaedic surgeons to the benefit of our patients. Our vision is to be recognised as a leader for the advancement of orthopaedic surgery through education, professional standards and advocacy.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Makes grants / loans to individuals

Health

Education / training / research

Other (please state)

(Members of the orthopaedic community)

Entity Structure

The New Zealand Orthopaedic Association is governed by an Executive Council. Day to day operations are managed by the Chief Executive and the secretariat staff.

Group Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the group, for example, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
8/01/2014 NOC004
26/03/2010 AR002

Group Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No group documents.