Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Wishbone Trust
CC21316
N/A
Registered

Registration details

21/02/2008
July 31

Address for service

C/O NZOA PO Box 5545
Wellington
6140
Ranchhod Tower LEVEL 12
39 The Terrace
Wellington Central
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

04 913 9891
04 913 9890


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of The New Zealand Orthopaedic Association Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
New Zealand Orthopaedic Association Incorporated
New Zealand Orthopaedic Association Incorporated Trust
New Zealand Orthopaedic Association Joint Registry Trust
The Wishbone Trust

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To promote research in various aspects of Orthopaedic Surgery. To promote and improve the Orthopaedic Services available to the people of New Zealand.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Provides advice / information / advocacy

Health

Education / training / research, People with disabilities, Research (health)

General public

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
James Andrew Blackett Treasurer 6/11/2023
Joesph Fredrick Baker Secretary 6/11/2023
Haemish Crawford Trustee 13/11/2015
Helen Tobin Trustee 13/11/2015
Richard Keddell Chair 7/08/2009

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Andrew Graydon Honorary Secretary 6/11/2023
Angus Wickham Honorary Treasurer 6/11/2023
Bryan Williams Patron 6/11/2023
Michael Pender Trustee 31/03/2021
Antony Field Treasurer 13/11/2020
Perry Charles Turner Trustee 13/11/2020
Jean-Claude Theis Trustee 31/07/2018
Stewart Walsh Honorary Treasurer 17/10/2017
Andrew Oakley Honorary Secretary 1/05/2016
Allan Panting Trustee 13/11/2015
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
21/03/2025 NOC027
9/08/2024 NOC025
16/11/2020 NOC021
8/03/2018 NOC017
7/03/2018 NOC016
21/12/2017 NOC014
21/12/2017 NOC013
29/06/2016 NOC010
13/04/2016 NOC009
13/04/2016 NOC008
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.