Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


New Zealand Orthopaedic Association Incorporated
CC43153
9429042870531
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
July 31

Address for service

PO Box 5545
Pipitea
Wellington
6140
LEVEL 12
39 The Terrace
Wellington Central
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

04 913 9894


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of The New Zealand Orthopaedic Association Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
New Zealand Orthopaedic Association Incorporated
New Zealand Orthopaedic Association Incorporated Trust
New Zealand Orthopaedic Association Joint Registry Trust
The Wishbone Trust

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The New Zealand Orthopaedic Association is the professional body representing orthopaedic surgeons in New Zealand with the aim of advancing the quality of orthopaedic practice through training and ongoing education of orthopaedic surgeons to the benefit of our patients. Our vision is to be recognised as a leader for the advancement of orthopaedic surgery through education, professional standards and advocacy.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Health

Education / training / research

Other (please state)

(members of the orthopaedic community)

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 January 2009 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 January 2010.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Alex Malone NZOA ACC and 3rd party liaison committee chair 21/10/2024
Edward Phillip Yee Second president elect 21/10/2024
Jennifer Susan Hicks LIONZ representative 21/10/2024
Nemandra Sandiford Small centre representative 21/10/2024
Christopher Hoffman First President Elect 6/11/2023
Georgina Chan Councillor 6/11/2023
Michael Norman Flint CPD & Standards Committee Chair 6/11/2023
Neville Strick Honorary Editorial Secretary 6/11/2023
Stephen Parkinson Councilor 6/11/2023
James Andrew Blackett Honorary Treasurer 2/11/2022
loading image for pagination

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Andrew Meighan Smaller Centres Representative 21/10/2024
Haemish Crawford Immediate Past President 21/10/2024
Joanna Sinclair LIONZ Representative 21/10/2024
Peter Alexander Robertson NZOA ACC & Third Party Liaison Committee Chair 21/10/2024
Andrew John Graydon Honorary Secretary 6/11/2023
Angus Munro Wickham Honorary Treasurer 6/11/2023
Edward Shouen YEE CPD & Standards Committee 6/11/2023
Gary John Hooper Honorary Editorial Secretary 6/11/2023
John Stuart McKie Immediate Past President 6/11/2023
Richard Charles Peterson Councillor 6/11/2023
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
21/12/2023 NOC027
16/11/2020 NOC023
16/10/2019 NOC021
10/10/2019 NOC020
10/10/2019 NOC019
10/10/2019 NOC017
30/01/2019 NOC016
5/12/2018 NOC015
10/01/2018 NOC013
8/01/2018 NOC012
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.