Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


New Zealand Orthopaedic Association Incorporated Trust
CC43154
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
July 31

Address for service

PO Box 5545
Pipitea
Wellington
6140
Level 12
Ranchhod Tower
39 The Terrace
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

04 913 9891
04 913 9890


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of The New Zealand Orthopaedic Association Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
New Zealand Orthopaedic Association Incorporated
New Zealand Orthopaedic Association Incorporated Trust
New Zealand Orthopaedic Association Joint Registry Trust
The Wishbone Trust

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To act as a Trustee of property for the purpose of advancing the science and art of orthopaedic surgery To undertake any work which may appear to the Society to be in accordance with its objects to be in accordance with its objects and to do such things that are incidental or conducive to the attainment of the objects of the Society.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Sponsors / undertakes research

Health

Education / training / research, Emergency / disaster relief, Fund-raising

Other (please state)

(Trainees/surgeons/health researchers)

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 January 2009 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 January 2010.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
David Phillip Cleal Trust 21/10/2024
Haemish Crawford Chair 6/11/2023
James Andrew Blackett Treasurer 6/11/2023
Joesph Fredrick Baker Secretary 6/11/2023
Angus Wickham Trustee 19/10/2020

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Simon Dempsey Trustee 21/11/2024
Cyril Arthur Wayne Hughes Trustee 21/10/2024
Andrew Graydon Honorary Secretary 6/11/2023
Andrew Peter Oakley Trustee 6/11/2023
Richard Street Chair 6/11/2023
Antony Field Honorary Treasurer 19/10/2020
Michael Caughey Trustee 19/10/2020
Perry Turner Honorary Secretary 19/10/2020
Grant Kiddle Trustee 30/09/2019
Hamish Leslie Trustee 30/09/2019
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/11/2020 NOC013
16/10/2019 NOC011
10/10/2019 NOC009
2/12/2015 NOC004
12/08/2015 NOC003
12/08/2015 NOC002
14/01/2015 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.