Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Group Summary


Group Members


Below are all the members of Pathway Charitable Group.

The group owner is required to complete a consolidated annual return on behalf of its members. Consolidated annual return information for these members is available in the Annual Returns tab below.

Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Motukarara Camp Incorporated
Pathway Affordable Housing Limited
Pathway Engineering Limited
Pathway Trust

Group Details


Pathway Charitable Group

Registration details

Registered
27/02/2017
CC54219
March 31

Address for service

44 Mandeville Street
Riccarton
Christchurch
8011

Group's other details

(03)9821952
(03)3494066


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: these Annual Returns contain consolidated financial information for all members of this group.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 17/10/2024 $11,896,233 $11,547,183 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/11/2023 5/12/2023 $10,492,922 $10,345,053 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/11/2022 1/11/2022 $10,577,438 $9,568,355 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/11/2021 5/07/2022 $6,407,718 $5,978,878 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 2/10/2020 $8,504,333 $8,595,462 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 31/10/2019 30/09/2019 $11,816,258 $12,086,481 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 31/01/2019 $10,143,430 $10,574,132 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 1/05/2018 $8,580,575 $9,044,682 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 3/03/2017 $8,244,588 $7,885,297 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Pathway Trust gives people a fresh start: those needing employment, those needing accommodation and individuals about to be released from prison.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (includes schools or other charities), Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Social services

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Employment, Disability

Other (please state)

(Disadvantaged People), Children / young people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, Children / young people

Entity Structure

Pathway Trust owns Pathway Engineering, a social enterprise whose profits are returned in full to the Trust, providing the majority of the Trust's funding.

Group Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the group, for example, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
6/07/2021 NOC006

Group Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No group documents.