Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Skills Consulting Group Limited
CC20799
9429034083314
Registered

Registration details

29/01/2008
December 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
ETITO CONSULTING LIMITED 30/01/2008
SKILLS CONSULTING LIMITED 18/09/2012
SKILLS INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 29/08/2014
THE SKILLS GROUP LIMITED 11/08/2020
Skills Consulting Group Limited 26/11/2020

Address for service

PO Box 24469
Royal Oak
Auckland
1345
LEVEL 2, BUILDING 2, THE CROSSING
60 HIGHBROOK DRIVE
EAST TAMAKI
AUCKLAND
2013

Charity's other details

021838765

Oceania

Australia, Fiji, Kiribati, Micronesia, Nauru, Niue, Papua New Guinea, Samoa, Solomon Islands, Tonga, Tuvalu, Vanuatu

Africa

Botswana, Kenya

North America

Canada, United States

Asia

China, East Timor, Indonesia, Malaysia, Philippines, Singapore, Thailand, Vietnam


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of The Skills Organisation Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Harrington\Vaughan Academy of Hairdressing Limited
Ignite Colleges Limited
Industry Connection for Excellence Limited
Premier Institute of Education Limited
Skills Consulting Group Limited
Skills Group Employment Limited
The Skills Group Foundation
The Skills Organisation Incorporated

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The purpose of the company is for its profits to be used solely for charitable purposes within New Zealand. The profits of the company from its trading operations, liquidation or otherwise shall be employed solely for charitable purposes, being the purposes and objects of The Skills Organisation Inc and shall not be used for the private pecuniary benefit of any individual.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Sponsors / undertakes research

Education / training / research

General public

Legal Structure

Company

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Diane Lesley Lithgow Director Trades School 24/02/2025
Marie Carmel Boyle Director, Digital, Learner Services, Operational Improvement 14/10/2024
Mark Andrew Arthur-Worsop Director Vocational Training 13/11/2023
Rosanne Mary Graham Director 1/07/2022
Gwyn Thomas Director Product, Innovation, Quality and Sales 10/05/2021
Jane Kennelly General Manager Wellbeing 23/11/2020
Scott Bitchener Chief Financial Officer 11/04/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Bridget Dennis Senior Vice President Global Markets 27/01/2023
Lance Riesterer General Manager Training & SME 16/12/2022
Nicky Jones General Manager People & Strategy 1/09/2022
Andrew Smith General Manager Product & Technology 26/08/2022
Garry Fissenden Chief Executive Officer 30/06/2022
Bridget O'Shannessey Director 27/06/2022
Cassandra Crowley Director 27/06/2022
Ian Butturini Director 27/06/2022
Rodney De Spong Director 27/06/2022
Timothy Gibson Director 27/06/2022
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
12/04/2022 NOC033
17/05/2021 NOC029
23/06/2020 NOC028
23/06/2020 NOC026
18/02/2019 NOC023
29/06/2018 NOC022
31/01/2018 NOC021
21/04/2016 NOC018
21/04/2016 NOC017
24/06/2015 NOC016
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.