Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Group Summary


Group Members


Below are all the members of The Skills Organisation Group.

The group owner is required to complete a consolidated annual return on behalf of its members. Consolidated annual return information for these members is available in the Annual Returns tab below.

Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Harrington\Vaughan Academy of Hairdressing Limited
Ignite Colleges Limited
Industry Connection for Excellence Limited
Premier Institute of Education Limited
Skills Consulting Group Limited
Skills Group Employment Limited
The Skills Group Foundation
The Skills Organisation Incorporated

Group Details


The Skills Organisation Group

Registration details

Registered
29/06/2017
CC54648
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 24469
Royal Oak
Auckland
1345
LEVEL 2. Building C, Millennium Centre,
600 Great South Road
Ellerslie
AUCKLAND
1015

Group's other details


Oceania

Australia, Fiji, Kiribati, Micronesia, Nauru, Niue, Papua New Guinea, Samoa, Solomon Islands, Tonga, Tuvalu, Vanuatu

Africa

Botswana, Kenya

North America

Canada, United States

Asia

Burma (Myanmar), China, East Timor, Indonesia, Malaysia, Philippines, Singapore, Thailand, Vietnam


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: these Annual Returns contain consolidated financial information for all members of this group.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 27/06/2024 $141,779,000 $145,901,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 16/05/2023 $112,212,000 $107,311,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 29/06/2022 $99,767,000 $84,857,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 29/06/2021 $76,139,000 $72,546,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 23/06/2020 $74,208,000 $74,800,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 30/05/2019 $65,494,000 $64,960,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 29/06/2018 $57,564,000 $56,180,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2017 $49,251,000 $46,509,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The general Object of The Skills Organisation, and The Skills Group, is the advancement of charitable purposes in New Zealand - and in particular the advancement of education focused on vocational education, training and learning - in connection with the various industries represented by The Skills Organisation and its Members.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds)

Education / training / research

Employment

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Children / young people

Entity Structure

The membership of The Skills Organisation comprises: 1. Incumbent Members: each of the incumbent Members as at the date of the Rules, provided that the membership of any such Member has not been subsequently terminated in accordance with the Rules; and 2. Other Industry/Professional Bodies/Organisation: any national industry or professional body or association or any other organisation, representing in whole or in part the interests of any private and/or public sector industry or industri

Group Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the group, for example, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
4/07/2022 NOC007

Group Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No group documents.