Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Skills Group Employment Limited
ETCO
CC61774
9429051691547
Registered

Registration details

1/11/2023
December 31

Address for service

Level 2, Building C, Millennium Centre
600 Great South Road
Ellerslie
Auckland
1051

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of The Skills Organisation Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Harrington\Vaughan Academy of Hairdressing Limited
Ignite Colleges Limited
Industry Connection for Excellence Limited
Premier Institute of Education Limited
Skills Consulting Group Limited
Skills Group Employment Limited
The Skills Group Foundation
The Skills Organisation Incorporated

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Company is established, and is to carry on its business, exclusively for Charitable Purposes in New Zealand, and in particular to advance the Charitable Purposes of The Skills Organisation, which the Company may do directly (through activities that advance any one or more of those Charitable Purposes) and/or indirectly (through activities that generate profits or surplus that can be distributed or applied to advance those Charitable Purposes).

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Employment

Education / training / research

General public

Legal Structure

Company

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 Member of 'The Skills Organisation Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 Member of 'The Skills Organisation Group' group - click here to view Annual Return

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Rosanne Mary Graham Director 27/10/2023
Scott Laughton Bitchener Director 27/10/2023

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
25/11/2023 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.