Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Ignite Colleges Limited
CC60011
N/A
Registered

Registration details

17/02/2022
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 24469
Royal Oak
Auckland
1345
98 Kerrs Road
Wiri
Auckland
2104

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of The Skills Organisation Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Harrington\Vaughan Academy of Hairdressing Limited
Ignite Colleges Limited
Industry Connection for Excellence Limited
Premier Institute of Education Limited
Skills Consulting Group Limited
Skills Group Employment Limited
The Skills Group Foundation
The Skills Organisation Incorporated

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Company is established, and is to carry on its business, exclusively for Charitable Purposes in New Zealand, and in particular to advance the Charitable Purposes of The Skills Organisation, which the Company may do directly (through activities that advance any one or more of those Charitable Purposes) and/or indirectly (through activities that generate profits or surplus that can be distributed or applied to advance those Charitable Purposes).

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Private training actives in Vocational Education )

Education / training / research

General public

Legal Structure

Company

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 Member of 'The Skills Organisation Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 Member of 'The Skills Organisation Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 Member of 'The Skills Organisation Group' group - click here to view Annual Return

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Rosanne Mary Graham Chief Executive Officer 1/07/2022
Scott Bitchener Director and Chief Financial Officer 1/01/2022

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Garry Fissenden Director 30/06/2022

Charity Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this charity.

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.