Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Sweet Justice Limited
CC50502
9429041077672
Registered

Registration details

23/04/2014
June 30

Address for service

Box 35049
Christchurch
8640
174 Gayhurst Road
Dallington
CHRISTCHURCH
8061

Charity's other details

03 3853535
03 3853536


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Trade Aid. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Sweet Justice Limited
Trade Aid Importers Limited
Trade Aid New Zealand Incorporated

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To undertake any business or activity, do any act or enter into any transaction provided however the company shall not excercise such powers or apply Company property unless such powers are excercised or such property is applied exclusively in furthering charitable purposes in New Zealand including, but without limitation, to educate New Zealanders within New Zealand about the nature of poverty and the need for fair trading conditions.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Manufacture of commodities from raw materials sourced from disadvantaged third world producers

Education / training / research

Promotion of volunteering, Education of New Zealanders on poverty

Other charities

General public

Legal Structure

Company
Trade Aid New Zealand Incorporated

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 Member of 'Trade Aid' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 Member of 'Trade Aid' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 Member of 'Trade Aid' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 Member of 'Trade Aid' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 Member of 'Trade Aid' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 Member of 'Trade Aid' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 Member of 'Trade Aid' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 19/12/2017 $488,024 $451,723 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 20/12/2016 $350,297 $386,327 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 22/12/2015 $307,187 $361,117 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Doug Spence Director 19/10/2015
Christopher Norman Knowles Director 3/02/2014
Geoffrey David Angus Director 3/02/2014
Geoffrey Stewart White Director 3/02/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
22/12/2015 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.