Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Mercy Foundation Limited
CC38425
9429032489569
Registered

Registration details

11/03/2009
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 6015
Wellesley Street
Auckland
1141
7 New Street
Saint Marys Bay
Auckland
1011

Charity's other details

09 360 8009
09 360 7870


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of McAuley Trust Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
McAuley Trust
Mercy Foundation Limited
St Catherine's Rest Home Limited

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Fundraising for development Congregational facilities

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Provides religious services / activities, Fundraising

Social services

Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Religious activities, Arts / culture / heritage

General public

Entity Structure

Consists of five directors
McAuley Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30/09/09 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30/09/2010.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Kilisitina Tupou Maliuoehau Vaeatangitau Director 13/12/2019
Mary Wood Director 13/12/2019
Raylene Anne Dwyer Director 8/11/2017
Susan Jayne France Director 8/11/2017
Judith Patricia Moroney Director 9/10/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Katrina Fabish Director 13/12/2019
Tui Heather Louise Cadigan Director 13/12/2019
Natalie Mary Murphy Director 8/11/2017
Anne Pauline Campbell Director 9/10/2015
Mary Frances Catherwood Director 9/10/2015
Denise Margaret Fox Director 30/04/2010
Kathleen Patricia Lynch Director 30/04/2010
Patricia Rowe Director 30/04/2010
Patricia Clare Vaughan Director 30/04/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
1/09/2023 NOC007
30/09/2020 NOC006
30/08/2012 AR004
14/09/2010 AR002
7/05/2010 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.