Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


University Of Waikato
CC30907
9429041925331
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

Private Bag 3105
Waikato Mail Centre
Hamilton
3240
Hillcrest Road
Hillcrest
Hamilton
3216

Charity's other details

07 8379720

Asia

China, Vietnam


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of University of Waikato Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
iEngagEd Limited
The Students Campus Building Fund Trust
The University of Waikato Foundation
The University Of Waikato Research Trust
University Of Waikato

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The University of Waikato provides goods and services for community and social benefit, primarily through the provision of tertiary education and research.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Tertiary education), Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Education / training / research

Education in tertiary sector

General public

Entity Structure

The University of Waikato is a public benefit entity, domiciled and operating in New Zealand and constituted as a university under the University of Waikato Act 1963.

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
iEngagEd Limited CC50195
The Students Campus Building Fund Trust CC31589
The University of Waikato Foundation CC29545
The University Of Waikato Research Trust CC36613
WaikatoLink Limited CC36875

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 Member of 'University of Waikato Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 18/06/2024 $317,426,000 $323,500,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 31/07/2023 19/09/2023 $263,390 $280,196 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 21/06/2022 $267,314,000 $264,313,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 28/06/2021 $265,800,000 $273,213,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 26/06/2020 $279,602,000 $271,450,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 17/06/2019 $278,264,000 $247,545,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 29/05/2018 $257,659,000 $234,868,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2017 $248,164,000 $234,720,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2016 $239,364,000 $231,123,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Tracy Bowell Acting Deputy Vice-Chancellor Academic 1/04/2024
Gary Wilson Deputy Vice-Chancellor Research 1/02/2024
Claire McLachlan Pro Vice-Chancellor 31/01/2024
George Zheng Liu Council Member 1/01/2024
Michelle Blake Council Member 1/08/2023
Maryanne McLeod Council Member 1/04/2023
Joanne Parekawhia McLean Council Member 15/12/2021
Meleane Burgess Council Member 8/09/2021
Patrick Leman Pro Vice-Chancellor 1/01/2021
Matt Bolger Pro Vice-Chancellor 3/08/2020
loading image for pagination

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Robyn Longhurst Deputy Vice-Chancellor, Academic 31/03/2024
Lushomo Thebe Council Member 31/12/2023
Bryony James Deputy Vice-Chancellor Research 31/10/2023
Paki Rawiri Council member 30/09/2023
Don Klinger Pro Vice Chancellor 31/08/2023
Eva Collins Council Member 31/07/2023
Kyla Campbell-Kamariera Council member 31/12/2021
Ngareta Timutimu Council Member 7/12/2021
Margaret Devlin Council Member 7/09/2021
Wayne Grenfell Morgan Council member 31/01/2021
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
22/05/2024 NOC026
7/10/2022 NOC024
19/03/2020 NOC020
24/10/2019 NOC019
11/06/2018 NOC017
22/11/2017 NOC015
19/04/2016 NOC013
24/04/2015 NOC012
10/03/2015 NOC011
10/03/2015 NOC010
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.