Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


GC Aid
CC31524
9429043163342
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31
GC3

Address for service

PO Box 744
Palmerston North Central
Palmerston North
4440
Level Two
Capital Fund House
357 Main Street
Palmerston North
4410

Charity's other details

06 882 9501

Oceania

Fiji, Micronesia, Papua New Guinea, Samoa, Solomon Islands, Tonga, Tuvalu, Vanuatu

Africa

Angola, Botswana, Cameroon, Central African Republic, Chad, Congo, Congo, Democratic Republic of, Ethiopia, Kenya, Liberia, Mozambique, Niger, Nigeria, South Africa, Uganda, Zambia, Zimbabwe

South America

Argentina, Brazil, Colombia, Ecuador, Paraguay

North America

Canada, El Salvador, Guatemala, Jamaica, Mexico, Nicaragua, Trinidad and Tobago, United States

Asia

Afghanistan, Burma (Myanmar), Cambodia, India, Indonesia, Israel, Japan, Jordan, Malaysia, Mongolia, Nepal, Philippines, Thailand, Turkey

Europe

Austria, France, Germany, Ireland, Italy, Norway, Spain, Ukraine, United Kingdom


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of GC3. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
GC Aid
GC Assist
Global Connections In Mission

Purpose & Structure


Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Community development

Education / training / research, Health, Emergency / disaster relief, Economic development

Voluntary bodies other than charities

Children / young people, Other charities, Migrants / refugees, Religious groups

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
John Donald Barris Trustee 13/07/2024
Rebecca de Jong Trustee 20/03/2021
Christopher Graeme Bailey Trustee 21/03/2020
Bruce William Stormer Trustee 2/04/2016
Christopher George Franklyn Trustee 3/03/2012

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Rebekah Louise Opie Trustee 13/07/2024
Richard Marshall Trustee 29/04/2023
Lynnette May Stark Trustee 20/03/2021
Christopher Douglas Hill Trustee 21/03/2020
Karen Brookes Trustee 21/03/2020
Russell Thorp Trustee 21/03/2020
Graham Duncan Fletcher Trustee 2/04/2016
David Cantwell Trustee 5/05/2014
John Hodgkinson Trustee 17/11/2012
William Stormer Trustee 4/03/2011
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
22/07/2024 NOC017
28/06/2023 NOC016
22/04/2021 NOC015
17/04/2020 NOC014
17/04/2020 NOC013
26/09/2019 NOC012
27/04/2016 NOC011
27/04/2016 NOC010
23/06/2015 NOC009
8/05/2014 NOC008
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.