Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Mercy Parklands Limited
CC31616
9429038785610
Deregistered
03/02/2025

Financial information at the time of Deregistration:

$0
$0

Below are details of Mercy Parklands Limited at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 3/02/2025 The charity is closing down permanently or has closed down (winding up)
Registered 30/06/2008

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Mercy Parklands Hospital & Retirement Home Limited 30/06/2008
Mercy Parklands Limited 28/07/2010

Address for service

PO Box 6015
Wellesley Street
Auckland Central
Auckland
1141
7 New Street
Saint Marys Bay
Auckland
1011

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of McAuley Trust Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
McAuley Trust
Mercy Foundation Limited
St Catherine's Rest Home Limited

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The purpose of the company is to provide quality and excellence in the care of the elderly.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Provides religious services / activities

Health

Education / training / research, Community development, Social services, Religious activities

Older people

Entity Structure

The company is managed by the board which consists of 1 directors plus the CEO.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Russell Florence Director 21/08/2023

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Aaron Gibb Bryan Hockly-Hodich Director 21/08/2023
Arthur Morris Director 21/08/2023
Barry Snow Director 21/08/2023
Joanna Mary Simon Director 21/08/2023
Nicholas George Francis Director 21/08/2023
Patricia Rowe Director 21/08/2023
Susan Keppel Director 29/07/2022
Denise Patricia Downey Director 11/05/2020
Francis Horton Tuck Director 15/04/2020
Denis Michael Wood Director 15/08/2019
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
15/09/2022 NOC013
9/05/2022 NOC011
7/10/2019 NOC007
17/02/2016 NOC002
31/07/2013 NOC001

Charity Documents


Notices

This entity was removed from a single entity group (CC31478) on 15 February 2024. Annual return information for the financial years up to and including the financial year ending 31 March 2023 is included in the consolidated annual returns for CC31478.

load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.